SADAKA

Charity number: 1171075
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 January 2020 16 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 January 2020 16 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 21 January 2019 02 December 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 January 2019 02 December 2019 11 days late Download
Annual return 01 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

24 September 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)