HOSPICE ETHIOPIA UK

Charity number: 1171781
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 April 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)