COVERDALE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1174155
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 January 2020 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not yet received
628 days overdue
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)