INTERNATIONAL NEEDS UK

Charity number: 1175526
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 August 2019 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)