VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520520
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 01 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 11 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 18 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)