THE MANSEL THOMAS TRUST

Charity number: 700480
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 January 2019 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 27 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)