STARMAKER THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 801294
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 January 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 January 2020 89 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

29 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 May 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 14 August 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014

( These accounts
have been qualified)

17 June 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)