BROADFIELD YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156601
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £31,828 £32,465 £35,000 £56,867 £38,729
Other income £81,706 £107,447 £84,881 £98,219 £115,464
Total expenditure £105,077 £117,993 £118,781 £122,972 £138,224