Family Fund Trust

Charity number: 1053866
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £35.55m £35.12m £33.50m £33.08m £33.05m
Other income £2.44m £1.84m £1.78m £2.35m £3.79m
Total expenditure £36.39m £36.76m £34.79m £34.78m £35.98m