MUSIC FOR ALL

Charity number: 1055371
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £41.17k £38.28k £73.50k £114.75k £119.47k
Total expenditure £66.44k £49.48k £62.64k £96.22k £113.19k