THE RAILWAY CHILDREN

Charity number: 1058991
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £211.39k £171.90k £171.90k £585.90k £1.02m
Other income £3.35m £2.87m £3.51m £3.67m £3.45m
Total expenditure £3.25m £3.33m £3.79m £3.81m £4.58m