BREAKTHROUGH BREAST CANCER

Charity number: 1062636
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £70.93k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £11.13m £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £14.18m £0 £0 £0 £0