CLINKS

Charity number: 1074546
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £823.15k £687.25k £631.44k £523.33k £739.34k
Other income £681.97k £691.61k £576.88k £759.76k £564.44k
Total expenditure £1.36m £1.54m £1.40m £1.23m £1.35m