BLUE VENTURES CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1098893
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £223.18k £178.95k £926.51k £1.37m £1.74m
Other income £1.68m £2.06m £2.08m £2.66m £4.54m
Total expenditure £1.27m £1.62m £2.29m £4.13m £5.28m