THE AGAINST MALARIA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1105319
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £36.65m £36.19m £26.53m £32.22m £30.94m
Total expenditure £26.35m £21.87m £15.17m £18.02m £52.24m