OPTIMUM POPULATION TRUST

Charity number: 1114109
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £309,937 £465,788 £316,651 £576,940 £788,938
Total expenditure £260,166 £348,664 £397,114 £429,064 £515,421