CROSSROADS IN HERTFORDSHIRE (NORTH AND NORTHEAST) CARING FOR CARERS

Charity number: 1121629
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £1.54m £1.34m £1.26m £1.31m £1.22m
Income from government grants £461.93k £507.34k £548.91k £127.94k £96.36k
Other income £132.42k £329.22k £519.92k £1.08m £1.55m
Total expenditure £1.99m £2.27m £2.29m £2.50m £2.82m