LILIAN FAITHFULL CARE

Charity number: 1122183
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £7.59m £8.55m £11.03m £11.23m £11.48m
Total expenditure £7.46m £8.14m £10.04m £10.81m £11.06m