MASONIC HALL IPSWICH LTD

Charity number: 1130452
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £90,962 £78,740 £80,220 £82,857 £85,599
Total expenditure £72,605 £62,001 £63,782 £86,032 £58,387