THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1132048
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £85.00k £50.00k
Other income £4.28m £10.06m £8.99m £7.74m £6.63m
Total expenditure £4.02m £5.42m £9.71m £9.08m £9.34m