SAVE THE ORANGUTAN

Charity number: 1133204
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £65.13k £64.56k £71.11k £21.36k £23.39k
Total expenditure £71.98k £72.91k £80.56k £12.91k £13.22k