THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, DORCHESTER ON THAMES

Charity number: 1133787
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £2.91k N/A
Other income £390.22k £180.30k £224.37k £191.92k £229.96k
Total expenditure £489.17k £201.31k £227.33k £216.60k £226.13k