NATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR GIVING VOICE

Charity number: 1140266
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £3,998 £2,910 £2,202 £2,343 £1,881
Total expenditure £9,143 £8,170 £5,515 £5,503 £6,081