RAILWAY BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 206312
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £628.12k £943.62k £517.44k £378.41k £388.86k
Total expenditure £622.39k £677.24k £677.24k £621.33k £613.42k