WILLIAM ADLINGTON CADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 213629
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £922,665 £1,034,039 £976,141 £2,938,588 £4,834,258
Total expenditure £943,861 £920,348 £914,846 £1,001,502 £1,171,912