CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOLDIERS', SAILORS' & AIRMEN'S CLUBS

Charity number: 226684
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £1,593,521 £1,783,415 £1,755,605 £1,641,030 £1,393,043
Total expenditure £1,591,141 £1,831,271 £1,805,799 £1,706,172 £1,535,025