C H HARRISON WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1069712
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
26/05/2015 26/05/2016 26/05/2017 26/05/2018 26/05/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £11.13k £11.50k £13.23k £10.72k £13.68k
Total expenditure £11.29k £8.74k £14.04k £10.83k £14.22k