ST. BARNABAS HOSPICES (SUSSEX) LTD

Charity number: 256789
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £514.00k £2.35m £774.00k £2.56m £960.00k
Income from government grants £1.56m £0 £1.57m £2.56m £2.52m
Other income £12.96m £15.78m £16.68m £13.38m £13.51m
Total expenditure £15.45m £15.46m £17.27m £19.31m £20.20m