THE MARGARET LOGAN BEER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071947
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total income £1.51k £1.81k £1.64k £1.85k £1.94k
Total expenditure £1.70k £1.33k £1.35k £3.44k £2.46k