HACKNEY ALLOTMENTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 294128
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total income £3.30k £4.03k £4.79k £4.64k £4.60k
Total expenditure £7.31k £2.37k £3.34k £2.61k £1.69k