UNIVERSITIES & COLLEGES CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 306137
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £4,939,552 £4,621,977 £3,762,208 £3,842,873 £4,282,811
Total expenditure £4,326,573 £3,961,339 £3,658,437 £3,958,508 £4,399,306