WALCOT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312800
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £2,387,000 £2,255,000 £2,675,522 £2,426,600 £2,765,824
Total expenditure £2,709,000 £2,413,000 £3,074,929 £3,056,949 £2,974,258