THE ROBERT ANDERSON RESEARCH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 800617
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £50.26k £54.11k £69.34k £61.30k £58.38k
Total expenditure £16.54k £31.00k £51.57k £92.88k £71.05k