AGUDAS ISRAEL ORGANISATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 290191
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £24.78k £0 N/A £39.72k
Other income £87.45k £108.75k £155.90k £118.37k £65.99k
Total expenditure £87.91k £133.30k £156.38k £118.31k £104.85k