THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1022834
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £928.73k £955.70k £1.41m £1.86m £1.51m
Total expenditure £599.09k £948.53k £1.03m £1.51m £1.23m