BALA LAKE RAILWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1151841
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £17.78k £35.83k £109.40k £33.74k £73.43k
Total expenditure £499 £7.80k £8.78k £32.18k £27.66k