THE BEDE GRIFFITHS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1106071
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £43,666 £58,825 £57,355 £59,195 £101,914
Total expenditure £45,927 £59,253 £60,468 £55,231 £75,677