BOSNIA & HERZEGOVINA COMMUNITY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1085815
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.05k £0 £5.00k £10.00k £20.01k
Other income £106.54k £101.27k £71.84k £115.74k £141.40k
Total expenditure £114.47k £98.68k £96.44k £117.32k £157.83k