GUILD INITIATIVE FOR FURNITURE TRUST

Charity number: 1015952
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Income from government contracts £59,196 £45,555 £38,641 £45,810 £68,160
Income from government grants £7,933 £8,700 £10,832 £10,000 £10,000
Other income £35,616 £39,700 £63,371 £87,907 £95,460
Total expenditure £99,236 £93,703 £112,190 £143,840 £161,924