INFOSOUND

Charity number: 1142082
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £57,112 £62,648 £70,282 £60,644 £34,038
Total expenditure £36,940 £45,882 £50,345 £46,167 £43,695