LONDON TOPOGRAPHICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 271590
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £34.17k £29.90k £50.99k £32.58k £35.84k
Total expenditure £50.28k £40.02k £33.85k £30.57k £32.43k