WILFRED JACKSON WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1148433
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £9.79k £10.54k £15.57k £7.48k £6.24k
Total expenditure £77.16k £54.61k £59.57k £73.01k £47.09k