THE BOOTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1062674
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £97,152 £169,287 £223,946 £222,734 £196,554
Other income £518,600 £462,471 £478,636 £518,527 £769,069
Total expenditure £475,440 £529,592 £780,833 £762,477 £917,592