BORDER TERRIER WELFARE

Charity number: 1116853
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £99.21k £98.54k £89.44k £83.77k £87.55k
Total expenditure £82.02k £96.36k £77.44k £72.25k £52.04k