CHARLIE AND KATHLEEN DUNNERY CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 1104342
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £19,277 £36,586 £19,115 £21,603 £28,487
Total expenditure £28,704 £33,734 £23,003 £31,349 £31,384