THE CO-MISSION INITIATIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1157383
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £403.76k £650.22k £279.33k £1.30m £1.14m
Total expenditure £324.64k £506.56k £357.79k £948.53k £1.30m