COMPASSION UK CHRISTIAN CHILD DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1077216
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £36,483,379 £39,006,069 £39,944,000 £41,598,000 £44,463,000
Total expenditure £36,719,878 £37,953,036 £39,360,000 £40,665,000 £43,819,000