THE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE (TEC)

Charity number: 1031482
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £263,750 £123,000 £124,953 £120,000 £226,175
Income from government grants £52,500 £43,245 £293,504 £41,699 £17,416
Other income £176,227 £404,370 £494,678 £300,252 £157,101
Total expenditure £351,099 £475,506 £897,706 £482,663 £555,424