INTERCOUNTRY ADOPTION CENTRE

Charity number: 1067313
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £467.44k £246.47k £286.98k £383.94k £509.06k
Income from government grants £93.58k £73.22k £141.71k £293.63k N/A
Other income £405.92k £785.77k £1.25m £1.35m £1.67m
Total expenditure £946.18k £1.12m £1.63m £1.97m £2.16m