ISLAMIC RESEARCH FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1122086
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £972,490 £951,356 £919,684 £587,142 £518,259
Total expenditure £789,490 £1,032,744 £906,610 £789,449 £602,183